Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 23:01:51 (UTC).

KENNEY, CHARLES E VS HILBERT, CAROL A Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 KENNEY, CHARLES E filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HILBERT, CAROL A. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNEY, CHARLES E

Defendants

HILBERT, ROBERT J SR

HILBERT, CAROL A

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/27/2019 ON CAROL A HILBERT

10/01/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/27/2019 ON CAROL A HILBERT

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/27/2019 ON ROBERT J HILBERT

10/01/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/27/2019 ON ROBERT J HILBERT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROL A HILBERT

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROL A HILBERT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT J HILBERT SR

09/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT J HILBERT SR

COMPLAINT

09/26/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/27/2019 ON CAROL A HILBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/27/2019 ON ROBERT J HILBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Payment received: $332.00 Receipt Number MX 89047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROL A HILBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT J HILBERT SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/14/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 472019SC000269SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Event Date: 11/14/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less