This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 04:36:23 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS WHITAKER, SHARON

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITAKER, SHARON. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant

WHITAKER, SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/22/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/22/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

02/22/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

02/22/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (PROPOSED)

02/22/2021:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

02/22/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 3/16/2021 ON SHARON WHITAKER

03/17/2021:SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 3/16/2021 ON SHARON WHITAKER

MEDIATION ORDER

03/18/2021:MEDIATION ORDER

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

03/18/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

04/09/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/18/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 3/16/2021 ON SHARON WHITAKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 103034

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000044SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.