This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/20/2019 at 23:03:17 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS SANTIAGO, JASICA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANTIAGO, JASICA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

SANTIAGO, JASICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 7/5/2019 ON JASICA SANTIAGO

07/08/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 7/5/2019 ON JASICA SANTIAGO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASICA SANTIAGO

06/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASICA SANTIAGO

SUMMONS TO JASICA SANTIAGO (PROPOSED)

06/26/2019:SUMMONS TO JASICA SANTIAGO (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING WITHIN COURT FILING

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/26/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 7/5/2019 ON JASICA SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASICA SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/15/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 86001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO JASICA SANTIAGO (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case 472019SC000168SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Event Date: 08/15/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C