This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 10:55:27 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, IRMA VS BASS-BROCK, KAYLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 HERNANDEZ, IRMA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BASS-BROCK, KAYLA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ, IRMA

Defendants

BROCK, BRANDON

BASS-BROCK, KAYLA

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT ($1,900.00)

02/28/2020:CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT ($1,900.00)

FINAL JUDGMENT

02/25/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT

COURT NOTES

02/18/2020:COURT NOTES

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($280.00)

02/05/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($280.00)

ORDER SETTING HEARING

02/05/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($620.00)

01/22/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($620.00)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($1,000.00)

01/21/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($1,000.00)

RESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

01/21/2020:RESPONSIVE PLEADING (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

RETURN OF SERVICE - KAYLA BASS-BROCK SERVED 1/14/2020

01/15/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - KAYLA BASS-BROCK SERVED 1/14/2020

RETURN OF SERVICE - BRANDON BROCK SERVED SUBSTITUTE 1/14/2020

01/15/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - BRANDON BROCK SERVED SUBSTITUTE 1/14/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO BRANDON BROCK

01/13/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO BRANDON BROCK

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO KAYLA BASS-BROCK

01/13/2020:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO KAYLA BASS-BROCK

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON BROCK

01/13/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON BROCK

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO KAYLA BASS-BROCK

01/13/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO KAYLA BASS-BROCK

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

01/13/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT ($1,900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/18/2020 10:30; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL HEARING; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($280.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEvent COUNTY CIVIL HEARING scheduled on 2/18/2020 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $289.00 Receipt Number MX 93616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $289.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO BRANDON BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO KAYLA BASS-BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 92755

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDON BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO KAYLA BASS-BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase 472020CC000005CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less