This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County on 10/22/2019 at 14:52:05 (UTC).

HERING, ROGER VS CUMMINGS, MARJORIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 HERING, ROGER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CUMMINGS, MARJORIE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERING, ROGER

Defendants

CUMMINGS, MARJORIE

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, DANIEL CARL

Defendant Attorney

DAS, AMY LYNN

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMAPNY BY SERVING ITS CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER 10/4/2019

10/18/2019:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMAPNY BY SERVING ITS CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER 10/4/2019

DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

10/10/2019:DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

10/09/2019:DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS

09/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY RA CHEIF FINANCIAL OFFICER

09/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY RA CHEIF FINANCIAL OFFICER

SUMMONS TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS (PROPOSED)

09/25/2019:SUMMONS TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY RA CHEIF FINANCIAL OFFICER (PROPOSED)

09/25/2019:SUMMONS TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY RA CHEIF FINANCIAL OFFICER (PROPOSED)

PLANTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS

09/25/2019:PLANTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS

PLANTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MARJORIE CUMMINGS

09/25/2019:PLANTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MARJORIE CUMMINGS

PLANTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

09/25/2019:PLANTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PLANTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

09/25/2019:PLANTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

09/25/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMAPNY BY SERVING ITS CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER 10/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY RA CHEIF FINANCIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY RA CHEIF FINANCIAL OFFICER (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLANTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO MARJORIE CUMMINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLANTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MARJORIE CUMMINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLANTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLANTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 88995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case 472019CA000266CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant