This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/24/2022 at 13:36:02 (UTC).

GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY VS BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GONZALEZ, EDGAR

MOLINA, JULIAN AGUILAR

HAGERDON, NOVA K

BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARCHER, DAVID ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/24/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

06/24/2022:COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

SUMMONS TO BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT ROBERT ENRICO (PROPOSED)

06/24/2022:SUMMONS TO BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT ROBERT ENRICO (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO EDGAR GONZALEZ (PROPOSED)

06/24/2022:SUMMONS TO EDGAR GONZALEZ (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA (PROPOSED)

06/24/2022:SUMMONS TO JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO NOVA K HAGERDON (PROPOSED)

06/24/2022:SUMMONS TO NOVA K HAGERDON (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT ROBERT ENRICO

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT ROBERT ENRICO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO EDGAR GONZALEZ

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO EDGAR GONZALEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA

SUMMONS ISSUED NOVA K. HAGERDON

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED NOVA K. HAGERDON

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NOVA HAGERDON SERVED 7/6/2022

07/11/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NOVA HAGERDON SERVED 7/6/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EDGAR GONZALEZ SERVED SUBSTITUTE 7/6/2022

07/11/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EDGAR GONZALEZ SERVED SUBSTITUTE 7/6/2022

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA SERVED SUBSTITUTE 7/6/2022

07/11/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA SERVED SUBSTITUTE 7/6/2022

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA SERVED SUBSTITUTE 7/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EDGAR GONZALEZ SERVED SUBSTITUTE 7/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NOVA HAGERDON SERVED 7/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED NOVA K. HAGERDON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO EDGAR GONZALEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT ROBERT ENRICO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $40.00 Receipt Number MX 118150

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO NOVA K HAGERDON (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO JULIAN AGUILAR MOLINA (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO EDGAR GONZALEZ (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BRAD GOODBREAD TRUCKING LLC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT ROBERT ENRICO (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 118112

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000130CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Archer, David Anthony