This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/15/2019 at 21:30:14 (UTC).

GOOLSBY, MELAINA GRACE, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 GOOLSBY, MELAINA GRACE, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

GOOLSBY, MELAINA GRACE

Appellee

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

HUSKISSON, LORI

 

Court Documents

ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND APPENDIX

07/10/2019:ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND APPENDIX

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- NOTICE TO ATTORNEY'S AND PARTIES

06/21/2019:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- NOTICE TO ATTORNEY'S AND PARTIES

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- NOTICE OF APPEAL TO APPELLATE PANEL

06/21/2019:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- NOTICE OF APPEAL TO APPELLATE PANEL

NOTICE OF APPEAL

06/21/2019:NOTICE OF APPEAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND APPENDIX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- NOTICE TO ATTORNEY'S AND PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE- NOTICE OF APPEAL TO APPELLATE PANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Payment received: $281.00 Receipt Number MX 85771

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $281.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Case 472019AP000163APAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUSKISSON, LORI