This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County on 10/22/2019 at 14:52:19 (UTC).

GAINES, DARRYL RYAN VS WALMART INC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 GAINES, DARRYL RYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Okeechobee County, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAINES, DARRYL RYAN

Defendant

WALMART INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALAIMO, MARIA RITA

Defendant Attorney

QUINTANA, CAROLINA MARIA

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/18/2019:PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

10/18/2019:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/18/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON DONNA MOCH, EMPLOYEE OF CT CORPORATION SYSTEM FOR WALMART, INC. 10/14/2019

10/16/2019:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON DONNA MOCH, EMPLOYEE OF CT CORPORATION SYSTEM FOR WALMART, INC. 10/14/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WALMART INC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT: CT CORPORATION

09/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO WALMART INC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT: CT CORPORATION

SUMMONS TO WALMART INC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT: CT CORPORATION (PROPOSED)

09/23/2019:SUMMONS TO WALMART INC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT: CT CORPORATION (PROPOSED)

COMPLAINT

09/23/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON DONNA MOCH, EMPLOYEE OF CT CORPORATION SYSTEM FOR WALMART, INC. 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO WALMART INC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT: CT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO WALMART INC BY SERVING REGISTERED AGENT: CT CORPORATION (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 88895

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Case 472019CA000260CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quintana, Carolina Maria