This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 04:46:04 (UTC).

EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC D/B/A VS FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC D/B/A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC D/B/A

Defendant

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREY, MILTON BARRINGTON

Defendant Attorney

PERL, BRIGETTE ELSA

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

07/21/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO CALL UP FOR HEARING AT THE JULY 22, 2021 PRETRIAL

07/21/2021:DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO CALL UP FOR HEARING AT THE JULY 22, 2021 PRETRIAL

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO CALL UP FOR HEARING AT THE JULY 22, 2021 PRETRIAL

07/21/2021:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO CALL UP FOR HEARING AT THE JULY 22, 2021 PRETRIAL

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY DISPOSITION

07/19/2021:DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY DISPOSITION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

06/29/2021:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/29/2021:DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/29/2021:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/29/2021:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

06/24/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

MEDIATION ORDER

06/24/2021:MEDIATION ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

06/23/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/14/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED

05/04/2021:SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (PROPOSED)

05/04/2021:SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (PROPOSED)

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

02/24/2021:PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODCUTION TO DEFENDANT

02/24/2021:PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODCUTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

02/24/2021:PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

02/24/2021:NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/22/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR; Defendant Attorney: PERL, BRIGETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO CALL UP FOR HEARING AT THE JULY 22, 2021 PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO CALL UP FOR HEARING AT THE JULY 22, 2021 PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000046SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 103142

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Expert Inspections (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases where Foremost Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIGETTE PERL