This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/16/2022 at 13:32:22 (UTC).

EPPS, ANITA VS FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 EPPS, ANITA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EPPS, ANITA

Defendants

SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2014 2 LLC

SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC

FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANNATTA, ROBERT TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC, C/O R.A CT CORPORATION SYSTEM SUBSERVED TO DONNA MOCH ON 06/21/2022

06/24/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC, C/O R.A CT CORPORATION SYSTEM SUBSERVED TO DONNA MOCH ON 06/21/2022

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO DONNA MOCH AS SR CORP OPS MGR FOR REGISTERED AGENT FOR SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2001-2, LLC 6/21/2022

06/24/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO DONNA MOCH AS SR CORP OPS MGR FOR REGISTERED AGENT FOR SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2001-2, LLC 6/21/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O R.A CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY SUBSERVED TO BROOKE SANCHEZ ON 06/22/2022

06/23/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O R.A CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY SUBSERVED TO BROOKE SANCHEZ ON 06/22/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT

06/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2014-2 LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT

06/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2014-2 LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY REGISTERED AGENT

06/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

06/16/2022:SUMMONS TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2014 2 LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

06/16/2022:SUMMONS TO SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2014 2 LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

06/16/2022:SUMMONS TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SPIRIT REALTY

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SPIRIT REALTY

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SPIRIT FL

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, SPIRIT FL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FLORIDA CONVENIENCE

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FLORIDA CONVENIENCE

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SPIRIT REALTY

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SPIRIT REALTY

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SPIRIT FL

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SPIRIT FL

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT FLORIDA CONVENIENCE

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT FLORIDA CONVENIENCE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST RQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

06/16/2022:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST RQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC, C/O R.A CT CORPORATION SYSTEM SUBSERVED TO DONNA MOCH ON 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO DONNA MOCH AS SR CORP OPS MGR FOR REGISTERED AGENT FOR SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2001-2, LLC 6/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O R.A CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY SUBSERVED TO BROOKE SANCHEZ ON 06/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2014-2 LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO SPIRIT FL TOWN STAR 2014 2 LLC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO FLORIDA CONVENIENCE STORES LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SPIRIT REALTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SPIRIT FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT FLORIDA CONVENIENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST RQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 117873

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000125CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPIRIT REALTY CAPITAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANNATTA, ROBERT TIMOTHY