Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 22:00:31 (UTC).

ELLERBEE, BILLY J VS ELLERBEE, STACEY E

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 ELLERBEE, BILLY J filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ELLERBEE, STACEY E. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BUCHANAN, LAURIE E and LAURIE BUCHANAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

LAURIE BUCHANAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELLERBEE, BILLY J

Respondent

ELLERBEE, STACEY E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • Event DOMESTIC REL HRG scheduled on 12/6/2019 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge LAURIE BUCHANAN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING 12/6/2019 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL SENT TO STACEY ELLERBEE - STANDING ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MARITAL SETTLEMENT AND STANDING ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 89030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 472019DR000400DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less