This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 04:37:17 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS THEROS, RICHARD W

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THEROS, RICHARD W. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

THEROS, RICHARD W

Okeechobee, FL 34974

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAMPLES, GARY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/12/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO RICHARD W THEROS (PROPOSED)

02/12/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO RICHARD W THEROS (PROPOSED)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO RICHARD W THEROS

02/12/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO RICHARD W THEROS

NOTICE TO APPEAR RETRUNED NON-SERVED ON RICHARD W THEROS

03/01/2021:NOTICE TO APPEAR RETRUNED NON-SERVED ON RICHARD W THEROS

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

03/22/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL

04/22/2021:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL

SUMMONS ( PROPOSED )

05/26/2021:SUMMONS ( PROPOSED )

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

05/27/2021:NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/07/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION

07/07/2021:FINAL DISPOSITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/22/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 7/22/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 106040

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ( PROPOSED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/18/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR RETRUNED NON-SERVED ON RICHARD W THEROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO RICHARD W THEROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO RICHARD W THEROS (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 102743

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000038SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samples, G Michael, II