This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 23:02:52 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS COLEMAN, DAVID D

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COLEMAN, DAVID D. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

COLEMAN, DAVID D

Okeechobee, FL 34974

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, MATTHEW STEWART

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO DAVID D COLEMAN

03/05/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO DAVID D COLEMAN

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO DAVID D COLEMAN (PROPOSED)

03/05/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO DAVID D COLEMAN (PROPOSED)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/05/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/05/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/22/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO DAVID D COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 4/22/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO DAVID D COLEMAN (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 103468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000064SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, MATTHEW STEWART