This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 14:07:20 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS BLOESER, ROBERT J JR

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against BLOESER, ROBERT J JR. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J and WALLACE, WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

BLOESER, ROBERT J JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

 

Court Documents

ALIAS SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

01/26/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT

01/22/2021:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT

LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

01/06/2021:LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

12/31/2020:LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

SUMMONS ISSUED ROBERT J BLOESER JR

02/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED ROBERT J BLOESER JR

SUMMONS TO ROBERT J BLOESER JR (PROPOSED)

02/28/2020:SUMMONS TO ROBERT J BLOESER JR (PROPOSED)

COMPLAINT

02/28/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/28/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 102239

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ROBERT J BLOESER JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO ROBERT J BLOESER JR (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 94618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase 472020CC000059CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.