This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/28/2019 at 23:30:37 (UTC).

CURCURITO, MARCELLA, SIEKMANN, GAIL Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 CURCURITO, MARCELLA, SIEKMANN, GAIL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SWEDA, STANLEY H

Decedent

SWEDA, RENNAE BELSKY

Not Classified By Court

SIEKMANN, GAIL

CURCURITO, MARCELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

COVEY, JAMES PRESCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • AMENDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 86121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DECLINATION TO SERVE, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (INTESTATE-FLORIDA RESIDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Case 472019CP000128CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COVEY, JAMES PRESCOTT