This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 04:37:09 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS TRANUM, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRANUM, JESSICA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

TRANUM, JESSICA

Okeechobee, FL 34974-6475

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUDSON, YACENDA KELA

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN, ARTHUR DREW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

02/12/2021:NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO JESSICA TRANUM (PROPOSED)

02/12/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO JESSICA TRANUM (PROPOSED)

COMPLAINT

02/12/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO JESSICAN TRANUM

02/12/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO JESSICAN TRANUM

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JESSICA TRANUM SERVED SUBSTITUTE 2/23/2021

03/03/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JESSICA TRANUM SERVED SUBSTITUTE 2/23/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUSEL FOR DEFENDANT

03/09/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUSEL FOR DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/09/2021:DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

03/09/2021:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

03/09/2021:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/09/2021:DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING THE CRDIT AGREEMENT

03/09/2021:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING THE CRDIT AGREEMENT

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

03/18/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/19/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION

04/19/2021:FINAL DISPOSITION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/22/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR; Defendant Attorney: RUBIN, ARTHUR D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 4/22/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/18/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR; Defendant Attorney: RUBIN, ARTHUR D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING THE CRDIT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUSEL FOR DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JESSICA TRANUM SERVED SUBSTITUTE 2/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO JESSICAN TRANUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO JESSICA TRANUM (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 102778

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000039SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN ARTHUR D