This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/07/2022 at 13:32:24 (UTC).

CLERK OF COURT FOR OKEECHOBEE VS Jupiter Asset Recovery Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 CLERK OF COURT FOR OKEECHOBEE filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Jupiter Asset Recovery. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLERK OF COURT FOR OKEECHOBEE

Defendants

Jupiter Asset Recovery

US DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY IRS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, TRAVIS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

11/15/2022:COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (PROPOSED)

11/15/2022:SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNTIED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA

11/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNTIED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA

NOTICE ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/15/2022:NOTICE ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

12/01/2022:NOTICE OF SERVICE

VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICES C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF FLORIDA SERVED ON 11/21/2022

12/01/2022:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICES C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF FLORIDA SERVED ON 11/21/2022

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

12/06/2022:ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICES C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SOUTHER DISTRICT OF FLORIDA SERVED ON 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNTIED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE C/O UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 122393

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000236CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER, TRAVIS RICHARD