This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 08/02/2019 at 23:01:51 (UTC).

CHRISTOFFERSEN, CONSTANCE VS CHRISTOFFERSEN, MICHEAL

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 CHRISTOFFERSEN, CONSTANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHRISTOFFERSEN, MICHEAL. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOFFERSEN, CONSTANCE

Defendant

CHRISTOFFERSEN, MICHEAL

Not Classified By Court

CHRISTOFFERSEN, MICHAEL

CHRISTOFFERSEN, CP

 

Court Documents

ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN

08/02/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN RETURNED UNSERVED

08/02/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN RETURNED UNSERVED

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DEFENDANT

07/12/2019:LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN

07/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/09/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 87264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLANTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Payment received: $191.00 Receipt Number MX 86353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MICHEAL CHIRSTOFFERSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/15/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Case 472019SC000175SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Event Date: 08/15/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less