This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/25/2019 at 23:04:25 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS SALGADO, GUADALUPE

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SALGADO, GUADALUPE. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

SALGADO, GUADALUPE

Okeechobee, FL 34974-7951

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO GUADALUPE SALGADO

10/02/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO GUADALUPE SALGADO

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO GUADALUPE SALGADO (PROPOSED)

10/02/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO GUADALUPE SALGADO (PROPOSED)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/02/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/02/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO GUADALUPE SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/14/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO GUADALUPE SALGADO (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 89256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 472019SC000276SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Event Date: 11/14/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel