This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 23:00:46 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS RHODEN, JOSHUA S

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RHODEN, JOSHUA S. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

RHODEN, JOSHUA S

Okeechobee, FL 34972-7453

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/03/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED JOSHUA S RHODEN

09/26/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED JOSHUA S RHODEN

COMPLAINT - BREACH OF CONTRACT

09/25/2019:COMPLAINT - BREACH OF CONTRACT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED JOSHUA S RHODEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 10/17/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 89040

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO JOSHUA S RHODEN (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT - BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 472019SC000268SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Event Date: 10/17/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel