This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 05:00:36 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS MCKINNEY, CHEVELA

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCKINNEY, CHEVELA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

MCKINNEY, CHEVELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

12/27/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/27/2021:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NON-MILITARY ADDIFAVIT

12/27/2021:NON-MILITARY ADDIFAVIT

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

12/27/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO CHEVELA MCKINNEY

12/27/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO CHEVELA MCKINNEY

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 1/13/2022 ON CHEVELA MCKINNEY

01/19/2022:SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 1/13/2022 ON CHEVELA MCKINNEY

RECORDED STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/20/2022:RECORDED STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/20/2022 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 1/13/2022 ON CHEVELA MCKINNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/20/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO CHEVELA MCKINNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 112428

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY ADDIFAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000409SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin