This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 05:00:50 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS BYRD, MELINDA S

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BYRD, MELINDA S. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM WALLACE, WALLACE, WILLIAM J and WALLACE, WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIAM WALLACE

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

BYRD, MELINDA S

Okeechobee, FL 34972-1564

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

12/27/2021:NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/27/2021:PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/27/2021:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO MELINDA S BYRD (PROPOSED)

12/27/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO MELINDA S BYRD (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO MELINDA S BYRD

12/27/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO MELINDA S BYRD

VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON MELINDA BYRD- SERVED 1/8/2022

01/14/2022:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON MELINDA BYRD- SERVED 1/8/2022

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

01/20/2022:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

02/11/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

02/11/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT

02/11/2022:AFFIDAVIT

RECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

02/24/2022:RECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/10/2022:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/20/2022 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON MELINDA BYRD- SERVED 1/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO MELINDA S BYRD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/20/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO MELINDA S BYRD (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 112434

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000411SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin