This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/27/2019 at 23:30:35 (UTC).

BENSON HUGHES, JENNIFER MINNET, BENSON, GEORGE C Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 BENSON HUGHES, JENNIFER MINNET, BENSON, GEORGE C was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BENSON, JOYCE M

BENSON, GEORGE C

Decedent

BENSON HUGHES, JENNIFER MINNET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HENDRICKSON, KEVIN HUGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 86081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE -JOYCE M BENSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE-GEORGE C BENSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT, AND ACCEPTANCE - JOYCE M BENSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT, AND ACCEPTANCE-GEORGE C BENSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (INTESTATE FLORIDA RESIDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Case 472019CP000126CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENDRICKSON, KEVIN HUGH