This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/31/2019 at 14:01:02 (UTC).

BENKO, PAL VS HOWARD, MARILYN M

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 BENKO, PAL filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HOWARD, MARILYN M. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENKO, PAL

Defendant

HOWARD, MARILYN M

Not Classified By Court

HOWARD, MARILYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIMS, HOWARD KENNETH

 

Court Documents

PRO-SE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

07/26/2019:PRO-SE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

07/23/2019:CERTIFICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY AND CHANGE CAPTION

07/23/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY AND CHANGE CAPTION

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RENT OWED

07/23/2019:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RENT OWED

NOTICE OF FILING NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

07/22/2019:NOTICE OF FILING NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION FOR SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF

07/19/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION FOR SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DEFENDANT'S ANWER

07/12/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DEFENDANT'S ANWER

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($165.00)

07/09/2019:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($165.00)

REPLY OF PAL BENKO (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

07/09/2019:REPLY OF PAL BENKO (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

SUMMONS FOR BACK RENT AND DAMAGES RETURNED SERVED 7/1/2019 ON MARILYN HOWARD

07/08/2019:SUMMONS FOR BACK RENT AND DAMAGES RETURNED SERVED 7/1/2019 ON MARILYN HOWARD

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 7/1/2019 ON MARILYN M HOWARD

07/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 7/1/2019 ON MARILYN M HOWARD

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

07/08/2019:ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($286.00)

07/03/2019:CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($286.00)

REPLY OF MARILYN HOWARD (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

07/01/2019:REPLY OF MARILYN HOWARD (EMAILED TO JUDGE)

CERTIFICATE OF DISTRIBUTION/MAILING

07/01/2019:CERTIFICATE OF DISTRIBUTION/MAILING

SUMMONS FOR BACK RENT AND DAMAGES ISSUED TO MARILYN M HOWARD

07/01/2019:SUMMONS FOR BACK RENT AND DAMAGES ISSUED TO MARILYN M HOWARD

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

07/01/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARILYN M HOWARD -RESIDENTIAL

07/01/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARILYN M HOWARD -RESIDENTIAL

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRO-SE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY AND CHANGE CAPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RENT OWED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF AND CHANGE CAPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION FOR SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Event COUNTY CIVIL HEARING scheduled on 8/1/2019 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DEFENDANT'S ANWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($165.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment received: $292.00 Receipt Number MX 86089

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR BACK RENT AND DAMAGES ISSUED TO MARILYN M HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARILYN M HOWARD -RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case 472019CC000157CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Event Date: 08/01/2019 10:45; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL HEARING; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIMS, HOWARD KENNETH