This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 12:11:56 (UTC).

BE A MAN BUY LAND LLC VS IN POSSESION, UNKNOWN TENANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 BE A MAN BUY LAND LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against IN POSSESION, UNKNOWN TENANT. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J and WALLACE, WILLIAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BE A MAN BUY LAND LLC

Defendants

ROQUE, MELADY

IN POSSESION, UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFITH, RENE STAROBIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

04/22/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

02/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MELADY ROQUE

02/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MELADY ROQUE

SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION (PROPOSED)

02/07/2020:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO MELADY ROQUE (PROPOSED)

02/07/2020:SUMMONS TO MELADY ROQUE (PROPOSED)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/07/2020:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

02/07/2020:VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/07/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MELADY ROQUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number MX 93803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO MELADY ROQUE (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase 472020CC000041CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLCO CREDIT UNION is a litigant