This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/11/2019 at 23:01:27 (UTC).

BARRETT, MARCUS Et Al VS CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 BARRETT, MARCUS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MD RUAL AREA DEVELOPMENT INC

BARRETT, MARCUS

Defendants

WILLIAMS, CHARLIE

CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, LANESHA LASHAE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/26/2019 ON CHARLIE WILLIAMS

09/27/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/26/2019 ON CHARLIE WILLIAMS

SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED 9/26/2019 ON CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

09/27/2019:SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED 9/26/2019 ON CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS

09/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC ATTN: CHARLIE WILLIAMS, REGISTERED AGENT

09/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC ATTN: CHARLIE WILLIAMS, REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS (PROPOSED)

09/17/2019:SUMMONS TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC ATTN: CHARLIE WILLIAMS REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

09/17/2019:SUMMONS TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC ATTN: CHARLIE WILLIAMS REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

COMPLAINT

09/17/2019:COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

09/17/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED 9/26/2019 ON CHARLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED 9/26/2019 ON CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC ATTN: CHARLIE WILLIAMS, REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/14/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 88698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO CHARLIE WILLIAMS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC ATTN: CHARLIE WILLIAMS REGISTERED AGENT (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Case 472019SC000259SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Event Date: 11/14/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less