This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/18/2019 at 23:00:49 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS DINGUS, LORETTA SUE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DINGUS, LORETTA SUE. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

DINGUS, LORETTA SUE

Okeechobee, FL 34974-8057

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARDO, MONIQUE KRISTINE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 10/1/2019 ON LORETTA SUE DINGUS

10/02/2019:NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 10/1/2019 ON LORETTA SUE DINGUS

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LORETTA SUE DINGUS

09/25/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LORETTA SUE DINGUS

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LORETTA SUE DINGUS (PROPOSED)

09/25/2019:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LORETTA SUE DINGUS (PROPOSED)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

09/25/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/25/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

09/25/2019:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 10/1/2019 ON LORETTA SUE DINGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO LORETTA SUE DINGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Event PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/14/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO LORETTA SUE DINGUS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 89021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Case 472019SC000265SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Event Date: 11/14/2019 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX COURTROOM D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARDO , MONIQUE K