This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 07/26/2019 at 22:00:16 (UTC).

BALTAZAR-PALACIO, MA. NELIDA VS ROJAS, DARIO ESPINAL

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 BALTAZAR-PALACIO, MA NELIDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROJAS, DARIO ESPINAL. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BALTAZAR-PALACIO, MA. NELIDA

Respondent

ROJAS, DARIO ESPINAL

Not Classified By Court

BALTAZAR, MA. NELIDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • ORDER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CLERK AS PROOF OF POSTING (WITH ATTACHED NOTICE OF ACTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DISCLAIMER AND NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • MOTION TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE/CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURES-MA. NELIDA BALTAZAR-PALACIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER-MA. NELIDA BALTAZAR-PALACIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)-MA. NELIDA BALTAZAR-PALACIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) WITH STANDING ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 472019DR000278DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less