This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 23:09:53 (UTC).

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LL VS AGUIRRE, CARLOS DENOVA

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AGUIRRE, CARLOS DENOVA. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Okeechobee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Okeechobee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LL

Defendant

AGUIRRE, CARLOS DENOVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

03/08/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

03/05/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO CARLOS DENOVA AGUIRRE (PROPOSED)

03/05/2021:SUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO CARLOS DENOVA AGUIRRE (PROPOSED)

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

03/05/2021:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/05/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/22/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 4/22/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO CARLOS DENOVA AGUIRRE (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 103470

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000065SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Autovest Financial Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B