This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:28:40 (UTC).

APONTE, EFRAIN, CARDONA, ROSA VICTORIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 APONTE, EFRAIN, CARDONA, ROSA VICTORIA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITE, REBECCA IVY and REBECCA WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

REBECCA WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARDONA, ROSA VICTORIA

Claimants

OKEECHOBEE UTILITY AUTHORITY

FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPAN

BUXTON BASS OKEECHOBEE FUNERAL

Decedent

APONTE, EFRAIN

Not Classified By Court

APONTE, ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FEE, FRANK HENRY

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FADLEY, JEFFREY ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - BUXTON BASS OKEECHOBEE FUNERAL HOME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketORDER ON BENEFICIARIES MOTION TO CHANGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OR ENSURE THAT NO ASSETS ARE SOLD, LIQUIDATED OR DISTRIBUTED UNTIL ALL BENEFICIARIES HAVE CONSENTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketEvent PROBATE HEARING scheduled on 5/12/2022 at 1005 AM, MX - Judge REBECCA WHITE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketESTATE INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE ON AGENCY FOR HEALTHCARE ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND; CONSENT TO PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING BUXTON BASS FUNERAL HOME AND CREMATORY STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 111827

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCase 472021CP000294CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/3/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Power & Light Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FADLEY, JEFFREY ALLEN