This case was last updated from Okeechobee County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 04:46:17 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS COOPER, JAMES E

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COOPER, JAMES E. This case was filed in Okeechobee County Courts, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLACE, WILLIAM J, WALLACE, WILLIAM and WILLIAM WALLACE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLACE, WILLIAM J

WALLACE, WILLIAM

WILLIAM WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

COOPER, JAMES E

Not Classified By Court

COOPER, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC

 

Court Documents

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

04/22/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO ATTY MODLIN - PTC ORDER

04/15/2021:RETURNED MAIL SENT TO ATTY MODLIN - PTC ORDER

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

03/18/2021:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM / ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/17/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE RE: RESCHEDULING

03/17/2021:E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE RE: RESCHEDULING

NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 3/9/2021 ON JAMES E COOPER

03/11/2021:NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 3/9/2021 ON JAMES E COOPER

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/25/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO JAMES E COOPER, A/K/A JAMES COOPER, A/K/A EDWARD COOPER II - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, INTERROGATORIES, AND PRODUCTION REQUEST IN AID OF ECECUTION FOR INDIVIDUALS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/22/2021 09:00; Judge: WALLACE, WILLIAM; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SUB-SERVED 3/9/2021 ON JAMES E COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL/MEDIATION CONFERENCE ISSUED TO JAMES E COOPER AKA JAMES COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 3/18/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WALLACE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS /NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION TO JAMES E COOPER AKA JAMES COOPER (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 103151

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase 472021SC000050SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric