This case was last updated from Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/25/2022 at 19:07:22 (UTC).

AC SMART CORP A FLORIDA CORPOR VS REICHERT, GEORGE W Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 AC SMART CORP A FLORIDA CORPOR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REICHERT, GEORGE W. This case was filed in Okeechobee County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Okeechobee County Courthouse located in Okeechobee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITE, REBECCA IVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Okeechobee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AC SMART CORP A FLORIDA CORPOR

Defendants

REICHERT, JUDY A

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A

REICHERT, GEORGE W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILKES, ALISA D

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITLE

06/15/2022:COMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITLE

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

06/15/2022:PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

06/15/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

06/15/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS TO JUDY A REICHART (PROPOSED)

06/15/2022:SUMMONS TO JUDY A REICHART (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC, REGISTERED AGENT: STEPHEN L DAY (PROPOSED)

06/15/2022:SUMMONS TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC, REGISTERED AGENT: STEPHEN L DAY (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUDY A REICHART

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUDY A REICHART

SUMMONS ISSUED TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC, REGISTERED AGENT: STEPHEN L DAY

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC, REGISTERED AGENT: STEPHEN L DAY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST SUBSERVED TO JIMI HUGHES ON 06/17/2022

06/21/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST SUBSERVED TO JIMI HUGHES ON 06/17/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE TO JUDY A REICHERT SUBSERVED TO DEBRA CEDRICK ON 06/17/2022

06/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE TO JUDY A REICHERT SUBSERVED TO DEBRA CEDRICK ON 06/17/2022

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

06/27/2022:ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/28/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

06/28/2022:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

06/28/2022:ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

REPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

07/14/2022:REPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO JUDY A REICHERT SUBSERVED TO DEBRA CEDRICK ON 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TO U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST SUBSERVED TO JIMI HUGHES ON 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC, REGISTERED AGENT: STEPHEN L DAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JUDY A REICHART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC, REGISTERED AGENT: STEPHEN L DAY (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO JUDY A REICHART (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 117769

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase 472022CA000123CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKES ALISA D