This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 07/27/2021 at 18:03:35 (UTC).

WILZ, WENDY vs. SCOTT, GEORGIA

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 WILZ, WENDY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SCOTT, GEORGIA. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GONTAREK, JOHN JAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19 F

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILZ, WENDY

Defendants

SCOTT, GEORGIA

MORGAN STANLEY & CO LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: NTC OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPOIES (GEORGIA SCOTT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO GEORGIA SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: GEORGIA SCOTTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF GEORGIA JENSEN SCOTTS DISCOVERY REQUEST TO PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLF'S ANSWER TO MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY LLC'S COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2021027454

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: ZOESCH, JOHN R III SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 001619 F, WILZ, WENDY VS. SCOTT, GEORGIA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: CLFS-6/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CLERKS LETTER AS TO FEES DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CA GENERAL CIVIL CROSS CLAIM/COUNTER CLAIM/COUNTER PETITION/3RD PTY COMPLAINT ASSESSED $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MORGAN STANLEY AND CO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEORGIA SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: CA DOCUMENT PREPARATION AND SUMMONS ASSESSED $34.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: OVERAGE GREATER THAN $10.00 ASSESSED $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE GONTAREK, JOHN JAY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/28/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 001619 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORGAN STANLEY & CO LLC is a litigant