This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 11/14/2021 at 21:35:00 (UTC).

THOMAS, DAVID MICHAEL vs. STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 THOMAS, DAVID MICHAEL filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWERS, MICHAEL A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35 C

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWERS, MICHAEL A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS, DAVID MICHAEL

Defendant

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ***DUPLICATE ORDER***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL **DUPLICATE**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: SA & PD SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002935 C, THOMAS, DAVID MICHAEL VS. STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: ODIS-9/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: THOMAS, DAVID MICHAEL SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002935 C, THOMAS, DAVID MICHAEL VS. STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: ODIS-9/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: MEMO TO DEF RE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: MEMO TO DEF RE:HABEAS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002935 C, THOMAS, DAVID MICHAEL VS. STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: WOHC-9/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS @ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE FLOWERS, MICHAEL A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/15/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002935 C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant