This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 18:04:12 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: WILLIAMSON, DAVID FRANKLIN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 THE ESTATE OF WILLIAMSON, DAVID FRANKLIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************60 C

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Applicants

TOUSSAINT, GINA RENE

WILLIAMSON, ROBERT JOHN

Decedent

WILLIAMSON, DAVID FRANKLIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL WILL FOR SAFE KEEPING - RECORDED (OR.3534.4759. / 3441123)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - RECORDED (OR.3534.4756. / 3441120)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMMISSION: MAILED TO JESSICA ROCKWELL 02/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL WILL FOR SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2021005058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3523.3595. / 3427858)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED (OR.3523.3591. / 3427856)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-FILED DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF RYAN MYNARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CP 000160 C

    Read MoreRead Less