This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 04/06/2021 at 18:02:39 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: SYKORA, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 THE ESTATE OF SYKORA, RICHARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************70 F

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Decedent

SYKORA, RICHARD

Applicant

SYKORA, DARYL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: SYKORA, DARYL SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CP 000170 F, THE ESTATE OF: SYKORA, RICHARD ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: ODPP-3/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER: DISPOSITION PERSONAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $241.50 RECEIPT #2021004804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES & REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT TO DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: OATH-ATTESTING ASSESSED $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CP 000170 F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: DISP PERSONAL PROPERTY ASSESSED $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less