This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 18:06:28 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: KALBAUGH, PATRICIA ANN

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 THE ESTATE OF KALBAUGH, PATRICIA ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19 C

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Applicant

KALBAUGH, ROBERT LAWRENCE JR

Decedent

KALBAUGH, PATRICIA ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROOF PUBLISHED/1ST DATE PUBLISHED: 03/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NTC TO CREDITOR 1ST PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT TO SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND WAIVER OF NOTICE (BRIAN LEE SCHADE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL WILL FOR SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT TO SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND WAIVER OF NOTICE (BRIAN LEE SCHADE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT TO SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND WAIVER OF NOTICE (TERRI LEIGH UNGER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2021006124

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3525.2686. / 3429881)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER OF MARK LYNN SCHADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-FILED DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF RYAN MYNARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/10/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CP 000219 C

    Read MoreRead Less