This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 03/28/2021 at 18:09:31 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: CRISSMAN, FRANCES BROWNING

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 THE ESTATE OF CRISSMAN, FRANCES BROWNING was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************27 F

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANCHORS SMITH GRIMSLEY

Decedent

CRISSMAN, FRANCES BROWNING

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

CRISSMAN, WILLIAM ALVIN JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROOF PUBLISHED/1ST DATE PUBLISHED: 2/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3525.717. / 3429427)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPT PERSONAL REP - RECORDED (OR.3525.716. / 3429426)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL WILL FOR SAFE KEEPING - RECORDED (OR.3525.711. / 3429425)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: ANCHORS, C LEDON; ANCHORS SMITH GRIMSLEY SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CP 000127 F, THE ESTATE OF: CRISSMAN, FRANCES BROWNING ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: OPTR-2/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSOLIDATED FROM 2021 SK 000121 F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION **DUPLICATE ORDER**

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL WILL FOR SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER FROM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/27/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CP 000127 F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/27/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 SK 000121 F

    Read MoreRead Less