This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 11/14/2021 at 18:09:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION vs. DAGESH 1216 OI LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against DAGESH 1216 OI LLC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STONE, WILLIAM F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32 F

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STONE, WILLIAM F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Defendants

DAGESH 1216 OI LLC

FORAKIS, ANN

FORAKIS, GUS S

MACK BUSBEE CFA OKALOOSA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

BEN ANDERSON OKALOOSA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

OKALOOSA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: STONE, WILLIAM F; Location: hearing to be conducted remotely via Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: COURT RESULT: HEARING SET FOR 11/12/2021 AT 2:00 PM - CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CANCEL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED BY MACK BUSBEE, OKALOOSA COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED DECLARATION OF TAKING / PARCEL NO: 116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING AND NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: PAPALAS AND GRIFFITH PLLC 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: ANN FORAKIS 10/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS UNSERVED: GUS S FORAKIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS UNSERVED: GUS S FORAKIS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: LIS PENDENS E-FILED - RECORDED (OR.3574.1440. / 3489007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONERS MOTION TO REGULATE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: DECLARATION OF TAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: LIS PENDENS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/15/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002932 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEN ANDERSON OKALOOSA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant