This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 18:07:19 (UTC).

SMITH, ADRIANNE RALPH vs. SMITH, DARYL EDWIN

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 SMITH, ADRIANNE RALPH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SMITH, DARYL EDWIN. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84 F

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, ADRIANNE RALPH

Respondents

SMITH IRONWORKS GEORGIA INC

DARYL E SMITH IRREVOCABLE TRUST (2012)

DESCO SPECIALTIES INC

SMITH, DARYL EDWIN

DARYL E SMITH REVOCABLE TRUST (1999)

DARYL E SMITH IRREVOCABLE TRUST (2004)

SMITH IRONWORKS INC

SMITH FAMILY LLC

ADRIANNE R SMITH IRREVOCABLE TRUST (2004)

SMITH AVIATION ADMINISTRATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

KEICH, JEREMY STEPHEN

MCGILL, ROBERT E III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: BROWN, JOHN T; Location: FWB COURTHOUSE ANNEX EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE & WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ANSWER & WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE & WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ANSWER & WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE & WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ANSWER & WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE & WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ANSWER & WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED BY CORPORATE ENTITIES' AND IRREVOCABLE TRUSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES & REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES - ATTORNEY ROBERT MCGILL III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED BY RESPONDENT/HUSBAND, CORPORATE ENTITIES, AND IRREVOCABLE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES & REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES - ATTORNEY JEREMY KEICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL: JEREMY KEICH ON BEHALF OF RESPS

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES & REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES-ANTHONY C BISORDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF: ADRIANNE RALPH SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FILER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: PARTIES INFORMATION SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/29/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 DR 001584 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITH FAMILY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEICH, JEREMY STEPHEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGILL, ROBERT EDGAR