This case was last updated from Okaloosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 11/29/2022 at 18:16:55 (UTC).

RHODES, NIKOLAI vs. HALL, JEFFREY ALLEN

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 RHODES, NIKOLAI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HALL, JEFFREY ALLEN. This case was filed in Okaloosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71 F

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHODES, NIKOLAI

Defendants

HALL, JEFFREY ALLEN

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUNER, DREW

Defendant Attorneys

PAPPAS, ALEXA M

SULLIVAN, JENNIFER A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - GENERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF JEFFREY HALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION: JENNIFER A SULLIVAN ON BEHALF OF UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION 10/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: JEFFREY ALLEN HALL 10/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022038838

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: BRUNER, DREW SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 CA 003071 F, RHODES, NIKOLAI VS. HALL, JEFFREY ALLEN ATTACHMENT COUNT: 3 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-9/30/2022,OPR-9/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVICE FEE CIRCUIT CIVIL ASSESSED $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JEFFREY ALLEN HALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO: JEFFREY ALLEN HALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO: JEFFREY ALLEN HALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/30/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 003071 F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN, JENNIFER A