This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 02/18/2022 at 18:06:25 (UTC).

PRODUCTION SERVICES INC vs. ROIL ENERGY LLC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 PRODUCTION SERVICES INC filed an Other lawsuit against ROIL ENERGY LLC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POLSON, MARY K and GONTAREK, JOHN JAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68 F

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POLSON, MARY K

GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRODUCTION SERVICES INC

Defendant

ROIL ENERGY LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER FROM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: EXPARTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE POLSON, MARY K: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: OCAD 2021-11 CIRCUIT AND COUNTY COURT DIVISION ASSIGNMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021052291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR PROCEEDINGS SUPPLEMENTARY AND DISCOVERY IN AID OF EXECUTION RE: DOMESTICATED FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE GONTAREK, JOHN JAY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/20/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 003968 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRODUCTION SERVICE COMPANY INC is a litigant