This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 11/13/2021 at 18:17:54 (UTC).

NEXPOINT REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LP vs. RT DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 NEXPOINT REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RT DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STONE, WILLIAM F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19 F

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STONE, WILLIAM F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEXPOINT REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LP

Defendants

RT DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC

FNF LAWYERS TITLE OF TEXAS INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: GORDON, A BENJAMIN SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002919 F, NEXPOINT REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LP VS. RT DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: OPR-10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION/ENLARGEMENT OF TIME (PLF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: FNF LAWYERS TITLE OF TEXAS INC 9/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: RT-DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC 9/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021038886

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: GORDON, A BENJAMIN SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002919 F, NEXPOINT REAL ESTATE ADVISORS LP VS. RT DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-9/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: OVERAGE GREATER THAN $10.00 ASSESSED $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVICE FEE CIRCUIT CIVIL ASSESSED $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: FNF LAWYERS TITLE OF TEXAS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: RT DESTIN ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/14/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002919 F

    Read MoreRead Less