This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 11/13/2021 at 18:16:57 (UTC).

MOORE, MICHAEL SHERMAN vs. STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 MOORE, MICHAEL SHERMAN filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWERS, MICHAEL A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************25 C

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWERS, MICHAEL A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE, MICHAEL SHERMAN

Defendant

STATE OF FLORIDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- SA RECIPIENTS: SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002925 C, MOORE, MICHAEL SHERMAN VS. STATE OF FLORIDA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: ODEN-9/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: JA/JUDGE STAFF ATTORNEY SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002925 C, MOORE, MICHAEL SHERMAN VS. STATE OF FLORIDA ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: P-9/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE FLOWERS, MICHAEL A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/14/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002925 C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR: HABIUS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant