This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 02/17/2022 at 01:03:58 (UTC).

MONEY, DAVID vs. ANDY K SOMESAN MD

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 MONEY, DAVID filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ANDY K SOMESAN MD. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are STONE, WILLIAM F and BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************58 F

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

STONE, WILLIAM F

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MONEY, DAVID

MONEY, DEBORAH

Defendants

ANDY K SOMESAN MD

SHARIF F ELKABBANI MD

FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC

ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES LLC

PAPPAS MD, CHRIS G

MAGNOLIA MEDICAL CLINIC PA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: SHARIF F ELKABBANI MD'S RESPONSE TO PLFS' FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: SHARIF F ELKABBANI MD'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: REPLY TO DEF'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLFS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE(S) TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (CHRIS G PAPPAS MD AND MAGNOLIA MEDICAL CLINIC PA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (CHRIS G PAPPAS MD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (MAGNOLIA MEDICAL CLINIC PA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES: CHRIS G PAPPAS MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES: MAGNOLIA MEDICAL CLINIC PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (ANDY K SOMESAN, MD)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: WARNER, DAVID MARC SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 003058 F, MONEY, DAVID VS. ANDY K SOMESAN MD ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: OPR-10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $442.00 RECEIPT #2021040749

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: OVERAGE GREATER THAN $10.00 ASSESSED $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/24/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 003058 F

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES LLC is a litigant