This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 02:38:29 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs. BAKER, HEIKE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAKER, HEIKE. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, JIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************00 C

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, JIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

BAKER, HEIKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • HearingEvent: SP PRE-TRIAL CRESTVIEW; Judge: WARD, JIM; Location: CRESTVIEW COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023003990

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: GREEN, JOHAN A SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023 SC 000200 C, MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS. BAKER, HEIKE ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: CIVILSUMMONS-1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED: HEIKE BAKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: SP PRE-TRIAL CRESTVIEW SET FOR 03/09/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CRV/ , JDG: WARD, JIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS AS TO HEIKE BAKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $1334.48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE WARD, JIM: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/31/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000200 C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less