This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 03/28/2020 at 18:03:29 (UTC).

LAKESIDE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF OKALOOSA COUNTY INC vs. WEGENER, TERESA

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 LAKESIDE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF OKALOOSA COUNTY INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WEGENER, TERESA. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STONE, WILLIAM F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44 F

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STONE, WILLIAM F

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKESIDE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF OKALOOSA COUNTY INC

Defendants

WEGENER, VALERIE H

WEGENER, TERESA

SPINNER, CHARLES S JR

HAMILTON, VICTORIA

Other

PRO SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERTS, JAY L

STRATTON, JOHN M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF VALERIE WEGENER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MEREDITH HORTON (PLF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF VICTORIA H HAMILTON INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MEREDITH HORTON (PLF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES: JOHN STRATTON ON BEHALF OF PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF VALERIE WEGENER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF VICTORIA H HAMILTON INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MEREDITH HORTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF VICTORIA H HAMILTON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MEREDITH HORTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: TERESA WEGENER 2/15/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: VICTORIA H HAMILTON BY SERVING ATTORNEY CHARLES S SPINNER JR 2/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: VALERIE WEGENER BY SERVING ATTORNEY DENISE A WELTER 2/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED BY TERESA WEGENER

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/28/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 000444 F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DENISE A WELTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: LIS PENDENS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TERESA WEGENER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: VICTORIA H HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES & REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES-JAY ROBERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL DOCKET SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRATTON, JOHN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS, JAY LAMAR