This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County on 11/14/2021 at 18:08:57 (UTC).

ISLANDER BEACH RESORT AND CONDOMINIUMS COUNCIL OF CO OWNERS INC vs. SUNSHINE SAND SEA LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 ISLANDER BEACH RESORT AND CONDOMINIUMS COUNCIL OF CO OWNERS INC filed an Other lawsuit against SUNSHINE SAND SEA LLC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Okaloosa County, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GONTAREK, JOHN JAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************38 F

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISLANDER BEACH RESORT AND CONDOMINIUMS COUNCIL OF CO OWNERS INC

Defendant

SUNSHINE SAND SEA LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: DOWD, JOHN ROBINSON JR SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002938 F, ISLANDER BEACH RESORT AND CONDOMINIUMS COUNCIL OF CO OWNERS INC VS. SUNSHINE SAND SEA LLC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 5 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: CIVS-9/15/2021,SDFF-9/15/2021,RFS-9/15/2021,CFD-9/15/2021,RECEIPT-9/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $417.00 RECEIPT #2021039334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: DOWD, JOHN ROBINSON JR SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CA 002938 F, ISLANDER BEACH RESORT AND CONDOMINIUMS COUNCIL OF CO OWNERS INC VS. SUNSHINE SAND SEA LLC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-9/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SUNSHINE SAND SEA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: OVERAGE LESS THAN $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS AS TO SUNSHINE.SAND.SEA.LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE GONTAREK, JOHN JAY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/15/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002938 F

    Read MoreRead Less