This case was last updated from Okaloosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 02/14/2023 at 01:28:16 (UTC).

HALL, JANICE MARIE vs. EMERALD COAST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 HALL, JANICE MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EMERALD COAST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Okaloosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KETCHEL, TERRANCE R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************72 F

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KETCHEL, TERRANCE R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALL, JANICE MARIE

Defendants

EMERALD COAST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC

BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

CHR FORT WALTON BEACH LLC AS TO EMERALD COAST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DWYER, RYAN G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE KETCHEL, TERRANCE R: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: OCAD 2022-09 DIVISION 001 AND DIVISION 006 JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE CHK#2220834 RETURNED. CK ALREAD VOIDED DUE TO STALE DATED. CK REISSUE SUBMITTED BASED ON LETTER FROM WILKES & ASSOCIATES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STAY AND DEMAND FOR ARBITRATION (HEARTHSTONE SENIOR COMMUNITIES INC BRIDGID HEALTH SERVICE LLC AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICEES LLC CHR FORT WALTON BEACH LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (EMERALD COAST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC 1/31/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2022001081

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RDWYER@YOURCASEMATTERS.COM RECIPIENTS: BECK, MICHAEL K ESQ SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 CA 000072 F, HALL, JANICE MARIE VS. EMERALD COAST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 6 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-1/7/2022,OPR-1/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: BECK, MICHAEL K ESQ SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 CA 000072 F, HALL, JANICE MARIE VS. EMERALD COAST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 6 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-1/7/2022,OPR-1/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CHR FORT WALTON BEACH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRIGID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: AIRMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EMERALD COAST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE POLSON, MARY K: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 000072 F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less