This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 04/04/2021 at 18:07:03 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF: VOIGHT, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 GUARDIANSHIP OF VOIGHT, ELIZABETH was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BROWN, JOHN T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82 F

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BROWN, JOHN T

 

Party Details

Applicant

KING, KATHY SUE

Not Yet Classified

VOIGHT, ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BROWN, JOHN T; Location: hearing to be conducted remotely via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATED MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: OATH GUARDIAN DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLENARY GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL: A WAYNE WILLIAMSON ON BEHALF OF FRANK ALLEN VOIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: HEARING SET FOR 02/19/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN ZOOM/ , JDG: BROWN, JOHN T

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION APPOINTING AS GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: OATH GUARDIAN DESIG RES AGENT ACCEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF:MICHAEL D WEINSTOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL: FRANK ALLEN VOIGHT, MICHELLE JONES, BRENDA VINYARD, DIANNE REBISH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 GA 000182 F

    Read MoreRead Less